Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann von Haugwitz

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1524Born
29 May 155530.7SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
25 Oct 155531.1ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
20 Oct 158157.1ResignedBishop-Elect of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
26 May 159671.7DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Haugwitz
Father Johann von Haugwitz (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThalheim

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast