Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maurus (Franz Xaver) Hartmann, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1865Born
21 Mar 188923.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Aug 189024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 189428.6AppointedPrefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania
15 Sep 190236.8ResignedPrefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania
20 Aug 190539.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Maurus (Franz Xaver) Hartmann
Father Maurus (Franz Xaver) Hartmann O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWald, Germany

  • a priest for 15.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast