Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Georg von Hallwyl

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555²Born
2 Jan 160146.0SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 Jun 160146.4ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 Sep 160146.7Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
11 Jan 160449.0DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg von Hallwyl (VIAF: 3210413)
Bishop Johann Georg von Hallwyl (born 1555, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBernhausen

  • a bishop for 2.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • ob: CB, 25 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Sep 2019

Quantcast