Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Hallam

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1406SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
23 Oct 1407AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
6 Jun 1411Elevated to Cardinal
4 Sep 1417DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Robert Hallam:
Bishop Robert Hallam (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,450
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 601
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 435
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 109
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013