Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Tibor Hajd˙, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1858Born
28 Mar 191051.4AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
21 Oct 191859.9DiedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Tibor Hajd˙
Abbot Tibor Hajd˙ O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlacePakod

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018