Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bonawentura Hahn

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
5 Dec 159656.9SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
19 Feb 159959.1ResignedBishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
29 Jun 160262.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonawentura Hahn
Father Bonawentura Hahn (born 1540, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlogowie

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast