Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Ludwig von Hagen

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1492Born
9 Aug 154048.6SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
10 Dec 154048.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
23 Mar 154755.2DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Ludwig von Hagen (VIAF: 45403479)
Archbishop Johann Ludwig von Hagen (born 1492, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlacePfalzel

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 44*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018