Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego HaŽdo

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1585AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
31 Mar 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
14 Aug 1589AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
5 Jul 1608DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego HaŽdo (VIAF: 76414081)
Archbishop Diego HaŽdo (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 99
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1500, Page 96, Number 605
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1585, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018