Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Habsburg (d’Autriche-Styrie)

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1590Born
7 Jul 160817.9AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 Jun 161423.8AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
1621¹30.4Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Dec 162434.3DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Habsburg (d’Autriche-Styrie)
Bishop Charles de Habsburg (d’Autriche-Styrie) (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a bishop for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121, and Page 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,621, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast