Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hieronymus Haberstroh, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect of Xining [Sining]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1893BornMariazell, Germany
190612.3ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
28 Jan 192329.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
12 Nov 193744.1AppointedPrefect of Xining [Sining], China
13 Aug 196975.9DiedPrefect of Xining [Sining], China

MicroData Summary for Hieronymus Haberstroh:
Priest Hieronymus Haberstroh S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect of Xining [Sining]

  • a priest for 46.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013