Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Giovannelli, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹Born
24 Sep 164425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Jan 165637.0AppointedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
11 Feb 168364.1DiedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Giovannelli
Bishop Vincenzo Giovannelli O.F.M. Obs. (born 1619, died ) Bishop of Pult (Pulati)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCattaro

  • a priest for 38.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,656, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast