Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fausto Guidotti

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1655Born
26 Jan 171156.0AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
6 Dec 173176.9DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fausto Guidotti
Bishop Fausto Guidotti (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOffida

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,711, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast