Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Romoaldo Cardinal Guidi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1722Born
1 Jun 177856.3Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 177856.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
23 Apr 178058.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

MicroData Summary for Romoaldo Guidi
Romoaldo Cardinal Guidi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018