Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugène Venance Guichard, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1883Born
190016.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jul 190824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jan 193248.0AppointedPrefect of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China
2 Mar 193753.1DiedPrefect of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China

MicroData Summary for Eugène Venance Guichard
Father Eugène Venance Guichard O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Yiduxian [Iduhsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Rouxiere, Diocese of Nantes, France
Death PlaceTsingchowfu

  • a priest for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 1 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast