Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Guerrieri Gonzaga

Deceased

Priest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1749Born
27 Sep 181970.5Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 181970.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
5 Feb 183282.9DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Guerrieri Gonzaga
Cesare Cardinal Guerrieri Gonzaga (born , died ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua

  • a cardinal for 12.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast