Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavao Gugler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular See: Omis/royal bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1820Born
186847.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
22 Feb 190988.6Died

MicroData Summary for Pavao Gugler
Bishop Pavao Gugler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 4 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017