Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Guerra, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornVillagarcía de Campos
17 Feb 164255.1SelectedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
16 Jun 164255.4ConfirmedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
26 May 165568.4SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Apr 165669.2ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Dec 165770.9DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Guerra:
Bishop Francisco Guerra O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192, and Page 282
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 172, Number 1,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015