Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alfonso Maria Guerrero Camacho, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1928Born
10 Jun 198253.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guapi, Colombia
26 May 198556.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Guerrero Camacho
Father Alfonso Maria Guerrero Camacho O.F.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, Cundinamarca

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast