Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Guégen

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1493AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
25 Sep 1500AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
2 Nov 1506DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Guégen
Bishop Guillaume Guégen (died ) Bishop of Nantes

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,500, Number 36*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199, and Page 193
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,493, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast