Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Leopold von Gudenus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1676BornErfurt
12 Aug 170528.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
16 Aug 170528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
19 Oct 171135.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
19 Oct 171135.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
17 Mar 171336.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Leopold von Gudenus:
Bishop Johann Leopold von Gudenus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 7.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015