Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sebastian Grossrubatscher (Gro▀rubatscher), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1888BornPufels, Italy
25 Aug 190416.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jun 191123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Mar 192638.0AppointedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China
29 Nov 192739.7DiedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Grossrubatscher (Gro▀rubatscher):
Priest Sebastian Grossrubatscher (Gro▀rubatscher) O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow]

  • a priest for 16.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013