Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Grimholt

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1510SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
8 Apr 1510ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
27 May 1523DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Grimholt:
Bishop Johannes Grimholt (died ) Bishop of Lübeck

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013