Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Grimani

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501¹Born
20 Feb 154039.1AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
23 Jan 154544.0AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
16 Dec 155049.9ResignedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
11 Nov 158584.8AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
3 Oct 159392.7DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Grimani
Patriarch Giovanni Grimani (born 1501, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162, and Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018