Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leopold Grimard, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Idah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1920BornSt-Adrien de Ham, Canada
1944²23.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Sep 194524.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 Oct 196847.9AppointedPrefect of Idah, Nigeria
17 Dec 197757.1ResignedPrefect of Idah, Nigeria
31 May 199675.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Idah, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leopold Grimard:
Father Leopold Grimard C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Idah

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016