Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Grimaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1562AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
8 Dec 1565AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
26 Nov 1572AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
11 Oct 1581DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Grimaldi
Bishop Carlo Grimaldi (died ) Bishop of Albenga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102, and Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 288
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018