Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alois Cardinal Grillmeier, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1910BornPechbrunn, Germany
24 Jun 193727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Nov 199484.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199484.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
13 Sep 199888.7DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Alois Grillmeier:
Cardinal Alois Grillmeier S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013