Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Griffoni (Grifonio) Pioppi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487¹BornTuscany
24 Jan 152841.0AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
25 May 152942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
15 Nov 154053.8AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
9 Apr 156780.2DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Griffoni (Grifonio) Pioppi:
Bishop Matteo Griffoni (Grifonio) Pioppi O.S.B. (born 1487, died ) Bishop of Trivento

  • a bishop for 37.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 251, and Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 16 May 2015