Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Birger Gregersson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1367AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
25 Jul 1367Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
10 Mar 1383DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Birger Gregersson
Archbishop Birger Gregersson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

  • a bishop for 15.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 508
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast