Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Vincent Greenan, S.P.S.

Superior Emeritus of Bomadi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1936 Born
22 Apr 196225.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
17 Mar 199154.5AppointedSuperior of Bomadi, Nigeria
15 Dec 199660.2CeasedSuperior of Bomadi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Thomas Vincent Greenan
Father Thomas Vincent Greenan S.P.S. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Bomadi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFenagh, Ireland

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bomadi.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 20 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018