Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspare Cardinal Grasselini, C.O. †

Deceased

Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1796BornPalermo, Italy
16 Jun 185660.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jun 185660.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
20 Dec 186771.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
16 Sep 187579.7DiedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Grasselini:
Cardinal Gaspare Grasselini C.O. (born , died ) Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

  • a cardinal for 19.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013