Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Grappler von Trappenburg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹Born
29 May 162726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
23 Apr 164645.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
23 Apr 164645.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
6 Jan 165857.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Grappler von Trappenburg
Bishop Ulrich Grappler von Trappenburg (born 1601, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 30.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018