Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Joseph de Grammont

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1644³BornChastillon-Guyotte
18 Mar 168641.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
18 Mar 168641.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
16 Jun 168642.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
15 Aug 169854.2SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
7 Sep 169854.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
20 Aug 171773.2DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph de Grammont:
Archbishop François-Joseph de Grammont (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 120, and Page 313
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015