Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Gozdzki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Isauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1673³Born
5 Jun 170026.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Dec 170127.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172248.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
6 Jul 172248.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
19 Mar 172551.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bernard Gozdzki
Bishop Bernard Gozdzki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKortnicen

  • a priest for 23.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast