Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (I)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1604Born
10 May 162722.9SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
29 Mar 163227.8ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
9 Oct 163329.3Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
28 Jul 164642.1SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
4 May 164843.9ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
1674²69.5ResignedBishop of Lisieux, France
14 Feb 168075.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (I)
Bishop Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (I) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorigni-sur-Vire

  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018