Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González Vallejo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1770BornSoto de Cameros
6 Aug 181948.6SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
27 Sep 181948.7ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Dec 181948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
25 Jun 182554.5ResignedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
30 Apr 184271.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González Vallejo:
Bishop Pedro González Vallejo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 22.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 249
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 139, Number 751

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015