Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Gouveia

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1584AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
29 Sep 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
4 Nov 1596DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Gouveia
Bishop Manuel de Gouveia (died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGouveia

  • a bishop for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018