Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Christian de Gournay

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France

Note/Previous Titular See: Sitiensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹Born
13 Feb 162640.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toul, France
13 Feb 162640.1AppointedTitular Bishop of the Titular See
22 Sep 163650.7AppointedBishop of Toul, France
14 Feb 163751.1InstalledBishop of Toul, France
14 Sep 163751.7DiedBishop of Toul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Christian de Gournay
Bishop Charles Christian de Gournay (born 1586, died ) Bishop of Toul

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 318, and Page 350
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,626, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast