Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bérard Cardinal de Got

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1250¹Born
23 Jul 128939.5AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
18 Sep 129444.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
18 Sep 129444.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 129747.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bérard de Got
Bérard Cardinal de Got (born 1250, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Villandraut, Archdiocese of Bordeaux, France

  • a cardinal for 2.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast