Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Gonthier

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
1 Jun 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
22 Jan 1333AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
1335¹DiedBishop of Quimper, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alain Gonthier
Bishop Alain Gonthier (died 1335) Bishop of Quimper

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimper

  • a bishop for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 211, and Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast