Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Lucreciano Onofre González, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Vichada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1922Born
22 Aug 194826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
28 Mar 196947.2AppointedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
4 May 197452.3ResignedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Lucreciano Onofre González
Father Lucreciano Onofre González S.M.M. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Vichada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChoachi

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast