Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Gomoliński

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
1580Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 1590AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
31 Jul 1591AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
30 Aug 1600AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
12 Dec 1602DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Gomoliński
Bishop Stanisław Gomoliński (died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 22.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast