Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gómez y Navas, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1778Born
3 May 183354.9SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
29 Jul 183355.1ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
26 Dec 183557.6DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Gómez y Navas
Bishop José Gómez y Navas T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntequera

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 250
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 149, Number 816
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast