Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Károly Gombos

Deceased

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kalocsa

Titular Bishop of Medaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1907BornÚjverbász
30 Oct 193225.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 194841.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
8 Nov 194841.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Medaba
12 Nov 198275.4DiedFormer Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Károly Gombos:
Father Károly Gombos (born , died ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 50.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 19 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015