Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Goldwell

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1472AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
4 Oct 1472Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 1496DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Goldwell:
Bishop James Goldwell (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 468
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 205
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013