Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Goglia

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1758Born
21 Dec 178224.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 181860.2SelectedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
21 Dec 181860.3ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
20 Apr 184081.6DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Goglia
Bishop Bartolomeo Goglia (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitulano

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 75
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018