Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvestre Godinho

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1229AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
4 Aug 1231³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
8 Jul 1244DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestre Godinho:
Archbishop Silvestre Godinho (died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,450
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013