Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González Acevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1534BornTorremormojón
27 Jul 158752.7AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
4 Oct 158752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Dec 159460.1AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
20 Nov 160975.1DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González Acevedo:
Bishop Pedro González Acevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,815
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013