Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Vincenzo Gonzaga

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1594Born
2 Dec 161521.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Dec 162733.8Died

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Gonzaga
(Layman) Vincenzo Gonzaga (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua

  • a cardinal for .7 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast