Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sigismondo Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1469BornMantua
1 Jan 150536.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 150638.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
10 Feb 151142.1AppointedAdministrator of Mantova, Italy
10 May 152152.4ResignedAdministrator of Mantova, Italy
152455.0AppointedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
1 Jul 152455.5ResignedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
3 Oct 152556.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Gonzaga:
Cardinal Sigismondo Gonzaga (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

  • a cardinal for 20.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jan 1505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013