Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pirro Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505²Born
5 Sep 152722.6AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
21 Nov 152722.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 152823.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
28 Jan 152924.0DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pirro Gonzaga (VIAF: 6225150567625706370000)
Pirro Cardinal Gonzaga (born 1505, died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua
Death PlaceSabbioneta, Diocese of Modena

  • a cardinal for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast